THE PRIMROSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle objectives of the Trust are to make donations and grants to such charitable institutions or authorities in such a manner as the Trustees may in their absolute discretion think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 September 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN MARIE BOYES-KORKIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM GORDON CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.02k | £119.19k | £131.82k | £143.57k | £144.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.00k | £145.79k | £160.30k | £160.70k | £155.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, HAVING REGARD TO THE DIRECTIONS OF THE SETTLOR DURING HIS LIFETIME. FOR FURTHER DETAILS, SEE TRUST DEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deloitte Llp
5 Callaghan Square
Cardiff
CF10 5BT
- Phone:
- 02920264257
- Email:
- lham@deloitte.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window