Governing document AGE CONCERN SWINDON
Charity number: 800056
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31ST AUGUST 1988 AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 1992, 2 JULY 1993, 6 JULY 1994, 14 APRIL 1997 AND 17 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND SWINDON.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN AND AROUND SWINDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.