HACKNEY BLACK AND ETHNIC MINORITY ELDERLY ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 21 November 1988: Standard registration
- 04 August 1995: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST JULY 1985 AS AMENDED ON 23RD OCTOBER 1986 AND 27TH OCTOBER 1988
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE ELDERLY IN HACKNEY, AND PARTICULARLY THOSE ELDERLY PEOPLE BELONGING TO AN ETHNIC MINORITY. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH CONCERNING THE NEEDS OF THE ETHNIC MINORITY ELDERLY IN HACKNEY, AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH. (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE HAVING NEEDS OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, AND WITH THE PURPOSE OF PROMOTING GOOD RACE RELATIONS.
Area of benefit
HOMETON AND CHATHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.