THE CRANFIELD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides free management support to voluntary organisations addressing issues of poverty, disability and social exclusion, working with a register of volunteers from the commercial sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£980,343
Donations and legacies | £966.78k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £3.80k | |
Investments | £9.76k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£977,333
Raising funds | £96.31k | |
Charitable activities | £881.02k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £65,798 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £96.31k | |
Charitable expenditure | £881.02k | |
Retained for future use | £3.01k |
People

21 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
1430 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 June 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Caveney | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Salma Bibi Ravat | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Elizabeth McMahon | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Mauger | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charmaine Helen Griffiths | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Clarke | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephanie Hussels | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £673.39k | £958.23k | £838.95k | £855.41k | £980.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £716.15k | £758.98k | £818.79k | £846.68k | £977.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £65.80k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £669.68k | £954.14k | £838.55k | £853.01k | £966.78k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.26k | £2.19k | £0 | £900 | £3.80k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.45k | £1.90k | £396 | £1.49k | £9.76k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £500 | £0 | £5.16k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £644.45k | £686.12k | £757.30k | £761.46k | £881.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £71.71k | £72.86k | £61.49k | £85.22k | £96.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £26.79k | £4.54k | £19.33k | £10.27k | £12.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.34k | £2.11k | £3.04k | £5.21k | £5.57k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £495.41k | £710.85k | £743.84k | £717.98k | £730.19k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £39.29k | £52.26k | £66.02k | £33.60k | £43.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH AUGUST 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16TH MAY 1989, 21 JANUARY 2003 AND 5 APRIL 2005 AND 8 SEPTEMBER 2008 as amended on 06 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
The Charity's objects are: 3.1.1 To promote and improve the efficiency and effectiveness of charities, not-for-profit organisations and voluntary groups supporting human welfare through the provision of management information, advice and support services. 3.1.2 To further such charitable purpose or purposes for the public benefit, according to the law of England and Wales, as the trustees in their absolute discretion from time to time determine. 3.2 Nothing in the articles shall authorise an application of the property of the charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005 and/or section 2 of the Charities Act (Northern Ireland) 2008. 3.3 For the purposes of these Articles of Association the Charity’s Area of Benefit is the United Kingdom.
Area of benefit
THIRD WORLD AND DEVELOPED COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
COURT ROOM CHAMBERS
1 BELL STREET
ROMSEY
HAMPSHIRE
SO51 8GY
- Phone:
- 01794830338
- Email:
- admin@cranfieldtrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window