HOLNE CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity invested the monies from the sale of the Church House Inn, Holne in 2018. The income from the investment is exclusively used for the upkeep and maintenance of the Church of St Mary the Virgin, Holne. The charity also holds the Playpark, Holne in trust for the recreation and enjoyment by the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 07 February 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Belinda Ann Owen | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Scott | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Watson Jones | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Geoffrey Simon Booty | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Paul Arrowsmith | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12 | £10.00k | £10.00k | £40 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.86k | £568 | £15.20k | £92.70k | £196 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 5TH JANUARY 1987 AND ORDER OF 11 MARCH 2004, AMENDED 30 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
(A) TOWARDS THE UPKEEP, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND INSURANCES AGAINST FIRE AND OTHER USUAL RISKS OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, HOLNE AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES THEREIN. (B) TOWARDS THE REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND INSURANCE OF THE FURNITURE AND CONTENS OF THE SAID PARISH CHURCH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HOLNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Andrews Parish Church
West Street
Ashburton
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ13 7DT
- Phone:
- 01364 654280
- Email:
- anthonyfp999@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window