Trustees SHUTTLEWORTH VETERAN AEROPLANE SOCIETY

Charity number: 800095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Stewart Leary Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Julian Leslie Harcourt Trustee 30 September 2018
None on record
Matthew Thorney Studdert-Kennedy Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
Rosemary Anne Hall Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
Paul Hilary Ferguson Trustee 31 May 2015
None on record
Alan Leslie Reed Trustee 26 July 2013
None on record
WILLIAM GRIGG Trustee
None on record
Neil Berwyn Thomas Trustee
None on record
Kevin John Panter Trustee
None on record