THE ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim if the Trust is to enhance and enrich the education and school life of the pupils of St bartholomew's School, by providing extra resources that cannot be met within the annual budget provided by the department of Education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 06 October 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daisy Hutchinson | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Charles Warner | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leila Hewetson | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Matthew Franklin-Wilson | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David William Fitter | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Brenton | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA RAY | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.90k | £6.50k | £16.90k | £4.41k | £6.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.72k | £12.54k | £15.66k | £3.97k | £156 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19/09/1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/10/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. BARTHOLOMEWS SCHOOL
ANDOVER ROAD
NEWBURY
RG14 6JP
- Phone:
- 01635576344
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window