THE NATIONAL NURSERY EXAMINATION BOARD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 03 October 1988: Standard registration
- 20 May 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 NOVEMBER 1990 AND 18 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 23 JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING PARTICULARLY IN NURSERY NURSING AND ITS ALLIED DISCIPLINES AND TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN PROMOTE AND SUPERVISE AND CONTROL STANDARDS IN NURSERY NURSING, IN PARTICULAR BY HOLDING OR ORGANISING AND SUPERVISING THE CONDUCT OF EXAMINATIONS AND OTHER TESTS OF COMPETENCY AND MAKING REGULATIONS GOVERNING SUCH EXAMINATIONS AND TESTS OF COMPETENCY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.