HACKNEY CHINESE COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote cultural recreations and to raise social and health well-being of the Chinese/Vietnamese Community. To establish educational standard amongst different age groups of the Chinese/Vietnamese community. To initiate and to foster racial harmony and to dispel feelings of racial discriminations so as to facilitate integration of the Chinese/Vietnamese into the society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £336,890 from 10 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
Governance
- 07 February 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Carol Snipe Farrell | Chair | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dora Dai Yun Lam | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yuet May Wong | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Siu Ming Cheung | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lai Wa So | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Loong-yu Christopher Au | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hiu Yeung Benjamin LEE | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Yan Wai Yu | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.12k | £196.63k | £401.32k | £299.08k | £491.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.82k | £131.56k | £282.90k | £257.11k | £617.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £27.78k | N/A | £27.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £84.83k | £29.12k | £261.05k | £179.42k | £336.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH AUGUST 1988, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 11TH NOVEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF HACKNEY AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND IN PARTICULAR CHINESE PEOPLE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF HACKNEY AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND IN PARTICAR AMONG CHINESE PEOPLE. 3. TO PROMOTE GOODRACE RELATIONS IN HACKNEY AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS BY ENDEAVOURING TO ELIMINATE DISCREIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE AND ENCOURAGING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS.
Area of benefit
HACKNEY LB
Contact information
- Address:
-
12-14 Englefield Road
LONDON
N1 4LS
- Phone:
- 020 8986 6171
- Email:
- INFO@HACKNEYCHINESE.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window