Financial history WOOLSTORE COUNTRY THEATRE

Charity Number: 800154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £40.52k £9.87k £23.33k £37.00k £51.00k
Total expenditure £34.87k £19.22k £28.09k £51.00k £53.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.17k N/A N/A