Trustees WOOLSTORE COUNTRY THEATRE
Charity number: 800154

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Clifford George Stride | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gavin John Park | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Mary Earley | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Russell North | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MALCOLM MUNRO | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER JOHNSON | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Rattray | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Alan Biggs | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Thornton | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Katharine Eileen Lorimer Treasurer | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.