Financial history LEEHURST SWAN LIMITED

Charity number: 800158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.45m £2.22m £2.15m £1.86m £2.20m
Total expenditure £2.42m £2.22m £2.16m £1.97m £2.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £32.33k £34.37k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.45m £2.12m £2.07m £1.80m £2.12m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.57k £1.57k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £97.18k £86.80k £62.31k £82.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.42m £2.22m £2.16m £1.97m £2.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.48k £0 £13.76k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0