Financial history PARSONS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 800162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.53k £5.25k £9.32k £5.98k £5.78k
Total expenditure £3.54k £2.10k £3.08k £2.42k £2.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A