Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY FOR DERMATOLOGICAL SURGERY
Charity number: 800213

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Bray | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lisa Naysmith | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Keohane | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Syed Walayat Hussain | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Oliphant | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harvinder Ghura | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.