THE DAVID CANTER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The David Canter Memorial Fund offers awards to give financial assistance to those working in the crafts. The fund is open to those who have finished their formal training and are working full-time or part-time but need money for specific projects, eg setting up a workshop, buying equipment, educational work or for research and travel. Awards are made every other year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 October 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAKE Southwest | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.22k | £872 | £792 | £984 | £10.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH AUGUST 1988 AS VARIED 24 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN THE CRAFTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE (B) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CRAFTS TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE PUBLIC APPRECIATION (C) TO ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP THE WORK OF AN INDIVIDUAL CRAFTSPERSON OR GROUP (D) SUBJECT TO OBJECTS (A), (B) AND (C) SUCH OTHER OBJECTS BEING CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAKE Southwest
Riverside Mill
Fore Street
Bovey Tracey
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
- Phone:
- 01626832223
- Email:
- devonguild@crafts.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window