HARLANDS PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School centered fund raising events. Funds raised are donated to the school for 'extras'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 October 1988: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF HARLANDS (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF HARLANDS SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kimberley Staines-Rebeiro | Chair | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Fairbairn | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Cook | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.49k | £17.59k | £24.92k | £27.87k | £36.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.92k | £18.72k | £21.82k | £41.30k | £13.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/09/1988 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 30 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT HARLANDS COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PUPILS.
Area of benefit
HAYWARDS HEATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harlands Primary School
Penland Road
Haywards Heath
RH16 1PJ
- Phone:
- 01444450782
- Email:
- harlandspta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window