Trustees ROYDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 800254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TAMMY BATCHELOR Chair 27 May 2013
None on record
Angela Brown Trustee 13 July 2022
None on record
Dominic Farrell Trustee 20 October 2021
None on record
Susan Pitt Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Jennifer Shorter Trustee 09 October 2013
None on record
ANDREW OLIVER DANIELS Trustee
None on record