CAMBRIDGESHIRE BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the association is to promote and further the craft of beekeeping by arranging meetings & lectures, stimulating co-operation among beekeepers & providing advice & assistance to beekeepers. Assistance is offered to horticulture and agriculture through beekeeping and information is provided to educational and other authorities. To advance their knowledge of bees and the craft of beekee
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 October 1988: Standard registration
- 09 May 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 09 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1183601 CAMBRIDGESHIRE BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.70k | £28.80k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.13k | £22.98k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 151 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 8TH OCTOBER 1988 as amended on 07 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CRAFT OF BEE-KEEPING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window