PAINTER STAINERS FINE ART TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Protecting, repairing, restoring pictures, silverware and other treasures
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- City Of London
Governance
- 19 October 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENJAMIN ETIENNE PRYOR | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|||||
PHILIP BROADHEAD | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Huddleston | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julian Edward Christian Briant | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/10/2019 | 18/10/2020 | 18/10/2021 | 18/10/2022 | 18/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.66k | £23.66k | £5.88k | £5.55k | £20.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.31k | £43.31k | £7.93k | £8.53k | £9.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 October 2023 | 12 December 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2021 | 11 January 2024 | 511 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2020 | 19 October 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2019 | 03 February 2021 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 27TH SEPTEMBER 1988 AS AFFECTED BY SCHEME DATED 15 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT, RESTORE AND TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE CITY OF LONDON THE LIVERY OF THE DONOR AND ANY OTHER PERSONS THE PICTURES, SILVERWARE AND OTHER TREASURES COMPRISING THE TRUST FUND.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worshipful Company of Painter
Stainers
Painters Hall
9 Little Trinity Lane
LONDON
EC4V 2AD
- Phone:
- 02072367070
- Email:
- clerk@painters-hall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window