Trustees Family Holiday Charity

Charity number: 800262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Webb Chair 08 May 2025
None on record
Ben Leet Trustee 13 December 2024
None on record
Saket Jasoria Trustee 08 August 2024
None on record
Adam Mark Reeves Trustee 08 August 2024
None on record
Davinia Batley Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
INGRID BUSSELL Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Jaqueline Ann Kerslake Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
Julie Dawn Tucker Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record