Trustees ADVISORY COUNCIL FOR THE EDUCATION OF ROMANY AND OTHER TRAVELLERS
Charity number: 800267

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Smith | Chair | 19 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tina Marie Bowers | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alunica Lepadatu | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Candace Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin Clark | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|||||
HAZEL MARSH | Trustee | 17 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brian Foster M.Ed | Trustee | 13 December 2012 |
|
|||||
ANNE WALKER | Trustee | 30 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR THOMAS ACTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.