THE CAMBRIDGESHIRE VIETNAMESE REFUGEE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The office will open from 11-16.00 week day, Mrs Johns our Chair will be responsible to help who need further assistance, due to our funding shortage therefore our trustees will happy to help our members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 October 1988: Standard registration
- CAMBRIDGESHIRE VIETNAMESE REFUGEE COMMUNITY (CVRC) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TRINH JOHNS | Chair | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
KHAC MAI NGUYEN | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MINH TRUNG LU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.06k | £9.79k | £13.32k | £15.12k | £6.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.53k | £8.11k | £10.61k | £12.69k | £5.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £3.84k | £3.92k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.84k | £4.57k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH AUGUST 1988
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR VIETNAMESE REFUGEES IN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF VIETNAMESE REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF VIETNAMESE REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST IN THEIR REHABILITATION WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. 4. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH REFUGEES AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
102 PERNE ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3RR
- Phone:
- 01223215231
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window