SURREY DOCKS FARM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Surrey Docks Farm is a city farm open to the public. Free access to all. School groups come to visit and learn. Blacksmith workshop, with apprentice programme and evening classes. Training programme for adults with learning difficulties. Opportunities to volunteer time to look after animals, plants, wild area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southwark
Governance
- 26 October 1988: Standard registration
- 19 April 2017: Funds received from 1146783 THE MINI COOKING CLUB
- 14 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 07 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 26 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 17 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 09 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/10/1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/12/2014
Charitable objects
(A)FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN AGRICULTURE,HORTICULTURE,HOME-CRAFTS,CARE AND CONSIDERATION FOR ANIMSAL IN COMMON AGRICULTURAL AND DOMESTIC USE THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FARM OR A FARM IN THAT PART OF THE DOCKLANDS URBAN DEVELOPMENT AREA THAT PRESENTLY FALLS WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK;(B)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTION OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SAID FARM;(C)IN THE COURSE OF SUCH ASSISTANCE AS IS REFERRED TO IN SUB-CLAUSE(B)TO PROVIDE SUBSIDIES GRANTS OR OTHER FINANCE TO ANY CHARITABLE BODY IN ORDER TO ENABLE THAT BODY TO PROVIDE THE SAID FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
PRESENT AREA OF THE METROPOLITAN POLICE DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window