Accounts and annual returns THE SIXTH FORM COLLEGE ASSOCIATION (COLCHESTER)

Charity number: 800295
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 October 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 October 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 09 October 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 October 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 09 October 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 October 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 09 October 2012 17 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 October 2012 Not Required