Governing document SOUTH DEVON RAILWAY TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH JANUARY 1974 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS INCORPORATED 11TH MARCH 1975 AND 12TH APRIL 1991 AND AMEDNED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 JUNE 2013 as amended on 05 Feb 2024 as amended on 05 Feb 2024 as amended on 05 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
3) The Objects of the Charity shall be for the public benefit to advance education in the history and development of railway transportation systems, by providing or assisting in the provision of opportunities that teach and deliver experience of how railways provided transport for people and goods throughout the 19th and 20th centuries, and to foster and support railway preservation and conservation, in particular (but not exclusively) by; a) The acquisition, preservation and operation of a heritage railway; b) The acquisition, preservation, conservation, maintenance and repair of: (i) Heritage locomotives and rolling stock; (ii) Heritage railway buildings, bridges, track, signalling systems and other historic railway structures and associated infrastructure; and (iii) Railway archives, historical records and artefacts; c) The establishment and maintenance of a railway museum or museums; and d) The provision of education and skills training in relation to the restoration, repair and operation of heritage railways, heritage railway vehicles, structures and associated infrastructure.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.