Accounts and annual returns NEWSLINE TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION (SOUTH WEST SOMERSET)

Charity number: 800314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 16 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 11 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 29 April 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 22 August 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required