Financial history NEWSLINE TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION (SOUTH WEST SOMERSET)

Charity number: 800314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £336 £2.27k £2.38k £1.70k £1.30k
Total expenditure £1.36k £1.54k £1.70k £881 £1.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A