Trustees NEWSLINE TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION (SOUTH WEST SOMERSET)

Charity Number: 800314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VALERIE BRACHER Chair 30 June 2016
VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Susan George Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Anne Fruin Trustee 25 July 2023
None on record
Hilary Hooper Trustee 22 October 2017
None on record
Julie Peadon Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record
Graham Everitt Trustee 27 June 2013
None on record
DAVID PEADON Trustee
None on record