THE EXAMINATION PRIZE FUND OF THE INSOLVENCY PRACTITIONERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awards prizes for success in insolvency examinations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 November 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARRIE-ANN JAMES | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN HELLARD | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
LLOYD HINTON | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.41k | £833 | £653 | £1.30k | £1.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH OCOTBER 1988
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT AND EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE INSOLVENCY PRACTITIONERS ASSOCIATION, PERSONS SEEKING TO BECOME SUCH MEMBERS OR SEEKING TO OBTAIN AN INSOLVENCY QUALIFICATION.(FOR FURTHER DETAIL PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 4(A) OF THE TRUST DEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
INSOLVENCY PRACTITIONERS ASSN
WORKING FROM SOUTHWARK
32-40 BLACKFRIARS ROAD
LONDON
SE1 8PB
- Phone:
- 02076235108
- Email:
- sarahm@ipa.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window