CHIPPING NORTON LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Runs the Chipping Norton Museum of Local History which collects and preserves artefacts,archives and photographs relating to Chipping norton and the surrounding area. Arranges speakers for a monthly of members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 October 1988: Standard registration
- 23 October 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1205796 CHIPPING NORTON LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY CIO
- CHIPPING NORTON MUSEUM OF LOCAL HISTORY (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.86k | £14.66k | £2.15k | £7.34k | £11.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.38k | £7.59k | £8.20k | £10.49k | £8.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £13.00k | N/A | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 19TH OCTOBER 1987 AND 11TH MAY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF CHIPPING NORTON, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
CHIPPING NORTON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window