Financial history ST JOHN'S INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 800340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.67k £3.29k £10.30k £11.43k £10.84k
Total expenditure £3.00k £3.55k £5.25k £5.55k £14.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A