ST JOHN'S INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to provide facilities and events for the pupils of St John's International School, Sidmouth and to assist in the promotion of the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 13 December 1989: Standard registration
- ST JOHNS SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- ST JOHN'S SCHOOL, PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie MacIsaac | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerstin Maria Lynita Wreford | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Dalton-Aram | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Caroline Burke | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karissa Ann Trelawny Marker | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.67k | £3.29k | £10.30k | £11.43k | £10.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £3.55k | £5.25k | £5.55k | £14.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 13TH OCTOBER 1988 AND 12TH OCTOBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF ST JOHN'S SCHOOL, SIDMOUTH, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
SIDMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHNS INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL
BROADWAY
SIDMOUTH
EX10 8RG
- Phone:
- 01395513984
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window