COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to advance and promote the science and use of telecommunications and to encourage the promotion and development of improvements in and improved means of telecommunications and the use thereof both generally and in particular for organisations of all kinds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 03 November 1988: Standard registration
- CMA (Working name)
- TELECOMMUNICATIONS MANAGERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Franklin | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31/3/ 78 AND AMENDED 11/8/ 88 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30/11/93, 7/7/94, AND 29/11/ 94, 19 /1/ 99 AND 6 /7/ 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/7/07
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE SCIENCE AND USE OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND TO ENCOURAGE THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND THE USE THEREOF BOTH GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR FOR ORGANISATIONS OF ALL KINDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Newbridge Square
Swindon
SN1 1BY
- Phone:
- 01793417417
- Email:
- cma@thecma.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window