EMBASSY BIBLE COLLEGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and ministry to the poor
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 November 1988: Standard registration
- 03 April 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EMBASSY BIBLE SCHOOL (Working name)
- EMBASSY CHRISTIAN OUTRACH (TRUST) (Working name)
- EMBASSY CHRISTIAN OUTREACH (Working name)
- EMBASSY CHRISTIAN OUTREACH FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.17k | £2.97k | £686 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.97k | £2.97k | £1.50k | £5.12k | £3.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 13 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 20 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 07 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 16 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 28/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD IN LONDON AND SUCH OTHER PLACE AND PLACES AS SHALL BE DECIDED UPON BY THE TRUSTEES AND TO PROVIDE PASTORAL CARE AND HEADLING FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND OUTLOOKS HOLDING SERVICES, DISCUSSIONS AND MEETINGS FOR PRAYER AND BIBLE STUDY, AND BY PROVIDING SUITABLE CRISTIAN LITERATURE AND OTHER TEACHING SIDS.
Area of benefit
LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window