THE CROSS AND STABLE CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE RENT OUT COMMERCIAL UNITS TO RAISE FUNDS FOR CHURCHES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 28 November 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Raymond Brine | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
REV PETER GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ANTHONY BROOKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.80k | £12.66k | £26.25k | £28.13k | £28.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.13k | £23.62k | £10.47k | £29.33k | £26.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST JANUARY 1987
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, THE METHODIST CHURCH, THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH AND THE BAPTIST CHURCH IN THE ECUMENICAL PARISH OF STANTONBURY IN THE CITY OF MILTON KEYNES, AND OF SUCH OTHER CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AS SHALL BECOME MEMBERS OF THE SAID ECUMENICAL PARISH AND ITS HEIRS AND SUCCESSORS, THROUGH THE MANAGEMENT OF THE CROSS AND STABLE COMMERCIAL UNITS.
Area of benefit
ECUMENICAL PARISH OF STANTONBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Huntley Crescent
MILTON KEYNES
MK9 3FZ
- Phone:
- 01908473562
- Email:
- kenneth.brine@sky.com
- Website:
-
Stantonbury.Net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window