Accounts and annual returns DENVER RYSTON ROXHAM AND FORDHAM PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800393
Charity reporting is overdue by 172 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 172 days
Accounts and TAR 15 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 172 days
Annual return 15 January 2023 20 February 2024 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 15 January 2022 18 January 2023 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 January 2022 08 March 2023 113 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 January 2021 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 January 2020 07 December 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 January 2020 Not Required