THE BERKSHIRE MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 800419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To aid and improve for the public benefit the condition of those living with multiple sclerosis by any lawful means including the following 1. By bringing together persons living with multiple sclerosis 2. By providing guidance and moral and practical support for persons living with multiple sclerosis; 3. By providing therapy including Oxygen Therapy for persons living with multiple sclerosis

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Hampshire
  • Oxfordshire
  • Reading
  • Slough
  • Surrey
  • West Berkshire
  • Windsor And Maidenhead
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BMSTC (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abigail Simmons Trustee 16 December 2024
None on record
Rachel George Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Ashley John Harrison Trustee 19 October 2023
None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN WEBB BSc Hons Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Gregg Jared Paul Burgess-Salisbury Trustee 15 June 2023
MOBILITY TRUST II
Received: On time
DANIELA HANUSKOVA Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
ROSALIND JEANETTE HATT Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
IMOGEN LAURA CLAIRE FLETCHER Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
SUSAN ELIZABETH BROWN Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Paul Antony Lawrence Shambrook Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record
NEIL JEFFREY DAWKINS Trustee 19 December 2019
None on record
PENELOPE JILL TILLSON Trustee 19 December 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £455.41k £426.42k £373.96k £501.49k £588.52k
Total expenditure £493.94k £465.63k £443.08k £509.98k £648.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £16.25k
Income from government grants £20.51k £48.16k £29.56k £28.63k £16.25k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £431.75k £467.33k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £65.17k £93.01k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £879 £1.00k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £3.70k £10.93k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £9 £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £382.56k £482.64k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £127.42k £159.60k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £12.45k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £6.11k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £697.57k £635.37k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £482.47k £409.86k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £142.68k £67.71k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bradbury House
23a August End
Brock Gardens
Reading
Berkshire
RG30 2JP
Phone:
01189016000
Email:
ms@bmstc.org