THE MORRIS SWIFT MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP TRUST
Charity number: 800421
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2004
Total income: £766
Total expenditure: £712
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 28 November 1988: Standard registration
- 07 November 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £766 | |
|
Total expenditure | £712 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 11 May 2005 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNITED KINGDOM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window