THE DOUGLAS BADER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation is established to advance & promote the physical, mental & spiritual welfare and benefit of persons who are without one or more limbs or otherwise physically disabled. This is delivered through Bader Braves Events, the inclusive information site for amputees www.limblossinformationcentre.com, The Bader Grant Scheme, Amputee games support and all inclusive "Bader Challenge" events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 November 1988: Standard registration
- 16 November 2020: Funds received from 1116594 PROSTHETICS AND ORTHOTICS REHABILITATION TECHNOLOG...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CLIVE PASCALL | Trustee | 21 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEWART KEITH RIDDICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JUSTIN CADBURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £350.29k | £219.09k | £803.09k | £353.53k | £377.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £464.14k | £299.14k | £758.80k | £627.30k | £461.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £34.54k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £768.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £64 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £34.54k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £587.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £171.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £9.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £425.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £3.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/08/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/1988 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/02/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE AND BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE WITHOUT ONE OR MORE LIMBS OR OTHERWISE PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2A
Conigre House
5 Kingsfield Grange Road
Bradford-on-Avon
Bradford-on-Avon
Wiltshir
- Phone:
- 07836552536
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window