Accounts and annual returns RECREATION ROAD PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800436
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 10 August 2024 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 16 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 September 2020 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required