CHELTENHAM PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
109 ARTS / CULTURE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 23 November 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MICHAEL KILSHAW | Chair | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Dalglish-Plant | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Dalglish-Plant | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Elizabeth Pegg | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mair Mainwaring | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL LOUISE WILKES | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
BHAVANDEEP STEPHENSON | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ELIZABETH PRICE | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEFF POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.94k | £11.78k | £1.26k | £20.98k | £19.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.43k | £8.01k | £449 | £20.52k | £18.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | N/A | N/A | £300 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 November 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH OCTOBER 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPPECTS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC ON A RECREATIONAL BASIS, TO GIVE PUBLIC CONCERTS, AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE CHELTENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Moorend Road
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL53 0EP
- Phone:
- 01242268926
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window