ST MARY'S SCHOOL ASCOT CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity promotes the charitable work of the Congregation of Jesus which promotes and provides for the advancement of education and religion, (with preference to girls of the Roman Catholic faith) and to help develop St Mary's School Ascot in the provision of bursaries, scholarships and grant-in-aid for the benefit of present and future pupils and for the maintenance and support of the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antonia Faye Brooks | Chair | 05 October 2017 |
|
|||||
MILLIE WENTWORTH-STANLEY | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte McBride | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisabel Mary Miles | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Walter Mitchell | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Calum Sillars | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £535.41k | £229.78k | £162.05k | £302.66k | £281.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.24k | £314.68k | £254.83k | £189.62k | £237.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £393.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £142.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £152.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £22.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £22.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02/11/1988 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/06/2015
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE CHARITABLE WORK CARRIED ON OR PROMOTED OR SUPPORTED BY THE INSTITUTE BEING WORK TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIGION (WITH PRECEDENCE TO FEMALE CHILDREN OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH) AND TO HELP TO DEVELOP ST MARY'S SCHOOL ASCOT WHERESOEVER BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS SCHOOL
ST. MARYS ROAD
ASCOT
SL5 9JF
- Phone:
- 01344293620
- Email:
- bursar@st-marys-ascot.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window