Financial history SOCIETY OF AFGHAN RESIDENTS IN UK

Charity number: 800460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.50k £4.87k £4.60k £2.16k £5.10k
Total expenditure £1.77k £4.28k £4.35k £2.53k £4.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A