HOPE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training Relief of Poverty Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newham
Governance
- 22 November 1988: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 September 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Ennals | Chair | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Temitope Alegbeleye | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Obatomi | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.63k | £78 | £0 | £0 | £11 | |
|
Total expenditure | £613 | £700 | £2.50k | £2.50k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST NOVEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL TRUST DEED DATED 10TH MAY 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM.
Area of benefit
UK AND OVERSEAS IN PARTICULAR NEWHAM LB
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Khartoum Road
LONDON
E13 8RF
- Phone:
- 02082576163
- Email:
- t.alegbeleye@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window