WILLIAM GEOFFREY HARVEY'S DISCRETIONARY SETTLEMENT NO 2

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing funding to animal focused charities to promote the well being and prevention of cruelty to animals and the preservation of wild animals and bird life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 November 1988: Standard registration
- THE HARVEY SETTLEMENT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY JAMES HULL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Brian Cooper | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ANNE HULL | Trustee | 07 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JOYCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.23k | £101.40k | £97.24k | £164.35k | £376.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.64k | £82.43k | £92.35k | £76.52k | £145.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE WELL-BEING AND PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS AND THE PRESERVATION OF WILD ANIMAL OR BIRD LIFE AS SHALL BE NOMINATED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE SETTLOR OR (AFTER THE DEATH OF THE SETTLOR), BY HIS WIFE OR IN DEFAULT OF SUCH NOMINATION SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE SAID PURPOSES AS SHALL BE NOMINATED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 SPRINGFIELD ROAD
SALE
M33 7XG
- Phone:
- 01619691467
- Email:
- sa.hull4harvey@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window