THE FRIENDS OF BLANDFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Friends shall be to provide support and assistance to patients of the Blandford Community Hospital and preserve and protect the health of the community by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities, support services and equipment not normally provided by the NHS or statutory authorities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 14 December 1988: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF BLANDFORD HOSPITAL (Working name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BLANDFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BLANDFORD HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH HICKISH | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicci Brown | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karabi Pluck | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Alan Marjoram | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Thorne | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Hayward | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Collingwood BROWN | Trustee | 08 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN COLE | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER RICHELL | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR BRIDLE | Trustee | 01 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM MILLER MCLAUGHLIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA ANN PRIOR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.98k | £1.33m | £228.76k | £247.91k | £195.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £513.21k | £159.63k | £298.58k | £190.54k | £240.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.68k | £19.83k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.23m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £98.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £11.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £1.19m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £60.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £51.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £6.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £23.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £47.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH MAY 1977 AS AMENDED 10TH JANUARY 1990 25TH MARCH 1994 AND 3 JULY 2002 as amended on 03 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
THE AREA SERVED BY THE NORTH DORSET PRIMARY CARE TRUST AND THE AREA SERVED BY THE FORMER WEST DORSET HEALTH AUTHORITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blandford Hospital
Milldown Road
BLANDFORD FORUM
DT11 7DD
- Phone:
- 01258450095
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window