ST JOHN’S DERMATOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meetings for education of trainees and consultant dermatologists in rare and challenging dermatological cases. Annual symposium based on a dermatological topic.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 December 1988: Standard registration
- ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL DERMATOLOGICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr IAN WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RICHARD BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.38k | £13.36k | £15.40k | £8.40k | £12.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.02k | £8.58k | £91.67k | £15.74k | £38.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 3RD JUNE 1988 as amended on 05 Jun 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF DERMATOLOGY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PRESENTATION AND DISCUSSION OF CASES, PATHOLOGICAL MATERIAL AND PAPERS, AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Counting House
Guys Hospital
Great Maze Pond
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07816905379
- Email:
- emma.craythorne@gstt.nhs.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window