Financial history TRUNCH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 800527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.16k £17.16k £21.98k £14.97k £28.58k
Total expenditure £9.92k £9.35k £7.42k £16.42k £15.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.90k £17.82k £3.17k N/A