NEW LONDON ORCHESTRA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The New London Orchestra offers music projects including concerts, recordings, and music-related education and outreach projects in schools and in the wider community. All projects aim to have an education element, whether through choice of repertoire, or through bringing the experience of live music to places it might not otherwise reach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 January 1989: Standard registration
- NEW LONDON CONCERT TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN PETER REGINALD WHITE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR DAVID BOGLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID BLAGBROUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.15k | £47.96k | £82.88k | £90.22k | £72.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.56k | £42.29k | £77.26k | £75.24k | £68.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC AND SINGING, BY PRESENTING AND PROMOTING, ORGANISING PROVIDING, MANAGING AND PRODUCING SUCH CONCERTS MUSICAL PIECES, OPERAS, OPERETTAS, BALLETS, ENTERTAINMENTS, LITERARY AND VISUAL MATERIAL AND EXHIBITIONS WHETHER ON ANY PREMISES OF THE COMPANY OR ELSE WHERE AS ARE NECESSARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Landgate Chambers
Rye
East Sussex
TN31 7LJ
- Phone:
- 01797 223340
- Email:
- ian@nlo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window