Governing document THE CAMBRIDGE CRYSTALLOGRAPHIC DATA CENTRE
Charity number: 800579

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH AUGUST 1987 AS AMENDED ON 7 DECEMBER 1999 AND 28 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 MAY 2010 as amended on 05 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE SCIENCE OF CHEMISTRY AND CRYSTALLOGRAPHY IN ALL ITS BRANCHES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.